U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00035
  • Case Name: MANN v. RALPH'S STORE LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2019
  • August 09, 2019: [Notice of Settlement and Procedural Order Re: Settlement]
  • August 01, 2019: [Order]
  • August 01, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
July, 2019
  • July 19, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
June, 2019
  • June 05, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
May, 2019
  • May 13, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend]
April, 2019
  • April 02, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend Procedural Order]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: [Order on Objection to Scheduling Order]
  • March 22, 2019: [Procedural Order Re: Local Rule 56(h)]
  • March 04, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
February, 2019
  • February 11, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.