U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-10061
  • Case Name: Robert Hickey
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 21, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Extend Time]
  • May 17, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Receipt of Installment Payment #3]
  • May 17, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Financial Management Course]
  • May 16, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Receipt of Installment Payment #2]
  • April 19, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 17, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Order Missed Installment Fee]
March, 2019
  • March 14, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Receipt of Installment Payment #1]
  • March 14, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Financial Management Course (eFinCert)]
February, 2019
  • February 17, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 15, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Have Filing Fee Waived]
  • February 15, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Have Chapter 7 Filing Fee Waived]
  • February 15, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Document]
  • February 14, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 14, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • February 12, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Order to Comply]
  • February 12, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • February 12, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • February 12, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 07)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.