U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-20043
  • Case Name: Mark Christopher Eisenbach
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Close Bankruptcy Case and Final Decree]
  • May 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • May 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Amended Schedules Statements]
  • May 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Discharging Debtor]
April, 2019
  • April 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Amended Schedules Statements]
  • April 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Amended Schedules Statements]
  • April 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Receipt of Installment Payment Final]
  • April 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules]
  • April 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Receipt of Installment Payment #3]
March, 2019
  • March 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Amended Schedules Statements]
  • March 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Amended Schedules Statements]
  • March 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Receipt of Installment Payment #2]
February, 2019
  • February 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Financial Management Course]
  • February 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Receipt of Installment Payment #1]
  • February 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • February 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Financial Management Course (eFinCert)]
  • February 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Matrix]
  • February 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Schedule G]
  • February 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • February 14, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 14, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • February 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • February 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Order to Comply]
  • February 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • February 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • February 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 07)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.