U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-20046
  • Case Name: Meaghan B. Dame and Corey M. Dame
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Close Bankruptcy Case and Final Decree]
March, 2019
  • March 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Dismiss Case]
  • March 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Dismiss Case]
  • March 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [File Tax Returns]
  • February 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [File Tax Returns]
  • February 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • February 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • February 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • February 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • February 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • February 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • February 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.