U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-10067
  • Case Name: Terrance Davis Smyth and Sharon Ann Smyth
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 28, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Close Bankruptcy Case and Final Decree]
  • May 24, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • May 22, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Discharging Debtor]
  • May 15, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • May 09, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Financial Management Course]
  • May 08, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 05, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Notice of Failure to file Financial Management Certification]
February, 2019
  • February 22, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • February 20, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • February 19, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • February 19, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.