U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00505
  • Case Name: LILLY v. JAMES M SEWALL CO INC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2019
  • December 20, 2019: [Notice of Settlement and Procedural Order Re: Settlement]
November, 2019
  • November 18, 2019: [Order]
  • November 18, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 16, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 16, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend]
July, 2019
  • July 18, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
May, 2019
  • May 07, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
February, 2019
  • February 21, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.