U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cv-00081
  • Case Name: LOISEL v. CLINTON et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 02, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
December, 2020
  • December 17, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 27, 2020: [Order on Motion to Stay]
January, 2020
  • January 14, 2020: [Order]
October, 2019
  • October 16, 2019: [Writ Issued]
  • October 16, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
September, 2019
  • September 24, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
July, 2019
  • July 09, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
June, 2019
  • June 21, 2019: [Order on Motion to Set Aside]
  • June 21, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • June 19, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend]
May, 2019
  • May 30, 2019: [Order on Motion for Entry of Default]
March, 2019
  • March 07, 2019: [Order for Service]
  • March 05, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
February, 2019
  • February 22, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.