U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00049
  • Case Name: LANG et al v. CITY OF PORTLAND
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 24, 2019: [Order Dismissing Case]
August, 2019
  • August 22, 2019: [Notice of Settlement and Procedural Order Re: Settlement]
  • August 01, 2019: [Order]
  • August 01, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
May, 2019
  • May 17, 2019: [Order]
March, 2019
  • March 06, 2019: [Order on Motion for Confidentiality Order]
  • March 06, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
February, 2019
  • February 22, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.