U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-10083
  • Case Name: Eric D Lavin and Bobbi-Jo Lavin
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 18, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 16, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Avoid or strip Lien]
  • April 01, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Financial Management Course]
  • March 01, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 01, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Amended Notice of Hearing]
  • March 01, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Entry]
  • March 01, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Proposed Order]
  • March 01, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 01, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Hearing Set]
  • March 01, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Avoid or Strip Lien]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • February 27, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • February 26, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • February 26, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • February 26, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • February 26, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.