U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00032
  • Case Name: WATERMAN v. PAUL G WHITE INTERIOR SOLUTIONS
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [Judgment]
  • July 31, 2020: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • July 31, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
April, 2020
  • April 08, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
January, 2020
  • January 14, 2020: [Order]
November, 2019
  • November 06, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 05, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
April, 2019
  • April 26, 2019: [Order for Service]
  • April 18, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
February, 2019
  • February 26, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.