U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-20086
  • Case Name: Antonio E. D'Alessio and Ann L. D'Alessio
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2020
  • May 05, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Response]
April, 2020
  • April 28, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Objection]
June, 2019
  • June 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Reminder of Ch. 13 Discharge Requirements]
May, 2019
  • May 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • May 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Change of Address]
  • April 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Domestic Support Obligations]
  • April 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Entry]
  • April 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing on Chapter 13 Confirmation]
March, 2019
  • March 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor ]
  • March 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Schedules and Statements]
  • March 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 14, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Extend Time]
  • March 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Extend Time]
  • March 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [File Tax Returns]
  • March 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [File Tax Returns]
  • March 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Order to Comply]
  • March 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • February 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • February 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • February 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.