U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-20100
  • Case Name: Michael D York, Sr.
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 14, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Response]
June, 2020
  • June 09, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Objection]
May, 2020
  • May 21, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Objection]
  • May 08, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Objection]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
December, 2019
  • December 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
June, 2019
  • June 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Objection]
  • June 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Service]
  • June 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Generic Motion]
  • June 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Chapter 11 First Day Motions]
  • June 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11]
  • June 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • June 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Convert Case 13 to 11]
  • June 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Convert Case 13 to 11]
  • June 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Reminder of Ch. 13 Discharge Requirements]
May, 2019
  • May 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing Set (misc-event pdf)]
  • May 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Proposed Order]
  • May 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Compensation]
  • May 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Extend Time]
  • May 14, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Extend Time]
  • May 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Extend Time]
  • May 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Convert Case 13 to 11]
  • May 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Compensation]
  • May 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
April, 2019
  • April 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Extend Time]
  • April 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Entry]
  • April 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Generic Motion]
  • April 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Extend Time]
  • April 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Schedules and Statements]
  • April 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing Set (misc-event pdf)]
  • April 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Amended Creditor Matrix (Fee)]
  • April 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Proposed Order]
  • April 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Compensation]
  • April 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor ]
March, 2019
  • March 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • March 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Extend Time]
  • March 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Extend Time]
  • March 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [File Tax Returns]
  • March 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • March 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Order to Comply]
  • March 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.