U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-20101
  • Case Name: John Arthur Arsenault and Carrie Ann Arsenault
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
April, 2019
  • April 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Entry]
  • April 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Amended Schedules Statements]
March, 2019
  • March 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Financial Management Course (eFinCert)]
  • March 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • March 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • March 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.