U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-20104
  • Case Name: Frederick Evan Jewell and Sherri Lynn Jewell
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Receipt of Installment Payment #3]
  • May 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Receipt of Installment Payment Final]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • April 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Financial Management Course]
  • April 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Receipt of Installment Payment #2]
  • April 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Request for Change of Address]
  • April 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Request for Change of Address]
March, 2019
  • March 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Receipt of Installment Payment #1]
  • March 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • March 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Document]
  • March 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Document]
  • March 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Order to Comply]
  • March 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Have Filing Fee Waived]
  • March 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Have Chapter 7 Filing Fee Waived]
  • March 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 07)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.