U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-10104
  • Case Name: Evan A Ring
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
June, 2019
  • June 03, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Financial Management Course]
May, 2019
  • May 16, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Relief from Stay]
April, 2019
  • April 24, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
March, 2019
  • March 20, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Tax Returns Transmitted to Trustee]
  • March 20, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Payment Advices Transmitted]
  • March 18, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • March 15, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • March 14, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 12, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • March 11, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 11, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 11, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • March 11, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.