U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cv-00102
  • Case Name: CLARK v. MAGNUSSON
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 03, 2020: [Judgment]
  • April 01, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • April 01, 2020: [Order on Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
November, 2019
  • November 21, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend]
May, 2019
  • May 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
  • May 06, 2019: [Order to Answer]
April, 2019
  • April 11, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
March, 2019
  • March 14, 2019: [Order]
  • March 14, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • March 13, 2019: [Order on Motion to Stay]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.