U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00494
  • Case Name: BIGHOPE v. HUGHES et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 22, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
June, 2019
  • June 21, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
April, 2019
  • April 04, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • April 02, 2019: [Order]
March, 2019
  • March 31, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • March 26, 2019: [Order on Order to Show Cause]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.