U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cv-00010
  • Case Name: FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION v. COLIZZI et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 21, 2020: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
  • October 21, 2020: [Order on Motion to Proceed with Foreclosure on Paper Record]
September, 2020
  • September 16, 2020: [Order]
  • September 16, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
October, 2019
  • October 11, 2019: [Order]
September, 2019
  • September 27, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 20, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • September 04, 2019: [Order on Order to Show Cause]
  • September 04, 2019: [Order on Motion for Entry of Default]
July, 2019
  • July 01, 2019: [Order on Motion for Service by Publication]
May, 2019
  • May 29, 2019: [Order on Motion for Service by Publication]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend]
  • April 01, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.