U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00118
  • Case Name: MCKENNEY v. JOYCE et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2021
  • January 05, 2021: [Judgment]
  • January 05, 2021: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • January 05, 2021: [Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings]
  • January 05, 2021: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
May, 2020
  • May 13, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
April, 2020
  • April 17, 2020: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • April 09, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
  • April 08, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
March, 2020
  • March 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
December, 2019
  • December 23, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Order for Service]
  • July 31, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • July 22, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
April, 2019
  • April 16, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 01, 2019: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.