U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cv-00133
  • Case Name: AMBROSE v. SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2020
  • May 15, 2020: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • May 11, 2020: [Judgment]
  • May 11, 2020: [SS Statement of Errors/Fact Sheet]
  • May 11, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
July, 2019
  • July 17, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend Procedural Order]
June, 2019
  • June 17, 2019: [Procedural Order Re: SS Appeals]
April, 2019
  • April 01, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.