U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-20155
  • Case Name: LeighAnn Garcia
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • April 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Dismissing Case]
  • April 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • April 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Order to Comply]
  • April 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Statement About Payment of Eviction Judgment (Form 101B)]
  • April 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • April 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Initial Statement of Eviction Judgment (Form 101A)]
  • April 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.