U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00132
  • Case Name: BERRY v. CRD METALWORKS LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 27, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend Procedural Order]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [Notice of Settlement and Procedural Order Re: Settlement]
March, 2020
  • March 17, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
December, 2019
  • December 16, 2019: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • December 16, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
August, 2019
  • August 20, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
June, 2019
  • June 03, 2019: [Order on Motion for Confidentiality Order]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
April, 2019
  • April 17, 2019: [Order on Objection to Scheduling Order]
  • April 04, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.