U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00099
  • Case Name: BIOMUNE COMPANY v. CLEAR H2O INC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2020
  • May 28, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • November 26, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • November 26, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
  • November 26, 2019: [Order on Motion to Stay]
October, 2019
  • October 21, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • October 01, 2019: [Confidentiality Order]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
May, 2019
  • May 13, 2019: [Order]
  • May 13, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 08, 2019: [Order on Objection to Scheduling Order]
April, 2019
  • April 05, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.