U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-20178
  • Case Name: Elizabeth Mary Pennington
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 29, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
April, 2019
  • April 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Financial Management Course]
  • April 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Have Filing Fee Waived]
  • April 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • April 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • April 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Have Chapter 7 Filing Fee Waived]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.