open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Maine

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Maine
    Case Number:19-20180
    Party Name:Joseph H. Zielinski and Holly L. Zielinski
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Amended Schedules Statements]
    Date Published:June 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Document]
    Date Published:May 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:April 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:April 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [File Tax Returns]
    Date Published:April 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing on Chapter 13 Confirmation]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:April 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:April 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
    Date Published:April 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.meb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?96262
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 2 =