U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00110
  • Case Name: MR AND MRS CATLING v. YORK SCHOOL DEPARTMENT
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 08, 2020: [Judgment]
  • December 08, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
November, 2020
  • November 20, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
August, 2020
  • August 14, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
July, 2020
  • July 09, 2020: [Order on Motion for Oral Argument/Hearing]
May, 2020
  • May 28, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
March, 2020
  • March 09, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
October, 2019
  • October 16, 2019: [Scheduling Order-IDEA Cases]
September, 2019
  • September 17, 2019: [Order]
August, 2019
  • August 20, 2019: [Order on Motion to Strike]
May, 2019
  • May 03, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal]
April, 2019
  • April 16, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.