U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cv-00166
  • Case Name: ALMODOVAR v. WILKIE
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 22, 2020: [Judgment]
  • December 22, 2020: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • December 22, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
October, 2020
  • October 08, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal]
January, 2020
  • January 24, 2020: [Order on Motion for Approval of Local Rule 56(h) Schedule]
  • January 22, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
November, 2019
  • November 01, 2019: [Procedural Order Re: Local Rule 56(h)]
October, 2019
  • October 24, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
June, 2019
  • June 06, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 02, 2019: [Order on Order to Show Cause]
May, 2019
  • May 06, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • April 18, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 18, 2019: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.