U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00116
  • Case Name: US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF9 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST v. HOLLOWAY et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [Order on Motion to Reopen Case]
December, 2022
  • December 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Substitute Party]
  • December 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Reopen Case]
April, 2021
  • April 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
March, 2021
  • March 10, 2021: [Order]
  • March 01, 2021: [Order]
January, 2021
  • January 06, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend Procedural Order]
April, 2020
  • April 06, 2020: [Order]
  • April 06, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
November, 2019
  • November 01, 2019: [Order]
October, 2019
  • October 18, 2019: [Order on Motion for Entry of Default]
September, 2019
  • September 19, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
April, 2019
  • April 22, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.