U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-10192
  • Case Name: Danielle A Hazelton
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 17, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 15, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Order on Document]
  • May 15, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Amend Application]
  • May 07, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Amended Application]
  • May 01, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Hearing Set]
  • April 29, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Order on Document]
  • April 28, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 26, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • April 25, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 25, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Have Chapter 7 Filing Fee Waived]
  • April 25, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.