U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00088
  • Case Name: FREEDOM MORTGAGE CORPORATION v. HAMILTON
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 02, 2021: [Judgment - Default]
  • December 02, 2021: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
March, 2021
  • March 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
January, 2021
  • January 05, 2021: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • January 05, 2021: [Order on Motion for Judgment]
November, 2020
  • November 02, 2020: [Order on Motion to Stay]
June, 2020
  • June 02, 2020: [Order]
February, 2020
  • February 18, 2020: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
January, 2020
  • January 03, 2020: [Order]
  • January 03, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
April, 2019
  • April 25, 2019: [Order on Motion for Entry of Default]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.