U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00137
  • Case Name: TAYMAN et al v. 5 TIDES HOME INSPECTIONS LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 08, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
December, 2019
  • December 09, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend Procedural Order]
October, 2019
  • October 24, 2019: [Notice of Settlement and Procedural Order Re: Settlement]
August, 2019
  • August 12, 2019: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • August 08, 2019: [Order]
  • August 08, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
July, 2019
  • July 12, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
April, 2019
  • April 25, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.