U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cv-00042
  • Case Name: FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION v. PARKHURST et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
September, 2019
  • September 27, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
July, 2019
  • July 22, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
May, 2019
  • May 20, 2019: [Order on Order to Show Cause]
  • May 10, 2019: [Order on Motion for Entry of Default]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.