U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-10203
  • Case Name: Janet M. Rohn and Ronnie Rohn
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 16, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 14, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Relief from Stay Consented]
  • May 02, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 01, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Financial Management Course]
  • May 01, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • April 29, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • April 29, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 29, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • April 29, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.