U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00059
  • Case Name: BRIGGS v. TOWN OF RUMFORD et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2020
  • July 08, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend Procedural Order]
June, 2020
  • June 12, 2020: [Notice of Settlement and Procedural Order Re: Settlement]
February, 2020
  • February 11, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
October, 2019
  • October 16, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
July, 2019
  • July 11, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.