U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-10213
  • Case Name: Tina Marie St. Laurent
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 16, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Objection]
June, 2019
  • June 21, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Response]
  • June 21, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Objection]
  • June 04, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Hearing Set]
  • June 04, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Extend Time]
May, 2019
  • May 17, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 15, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Have Filing Fee Waived]
  • May 09, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 08, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 07, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • May 06, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Extend Time for Credit Counseling]
  • May 06, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Order to Comply]
  • May 06, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Extend Time for Credit Counseling]
  • May 06, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Have Chapter 7 Filing Fee Waived]
  • May 06, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 07)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.