U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00130
  • Case Name: US BANK TRUST NA v. STEVENS
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2020
  • June 03, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
March, 2020
  • March 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Judgment]
February, 2020
  • February 06, 2020: [Notice of Settlement and Procedural Order Re: Settlement]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • January 02, 2020: [Order]
  • January 02, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
December, 2019
  • December 26, 2019: [Order on Motion to Stay]
June, 2019
  • June 26, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 04, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
May, 2019
  • May 06, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.