U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00131
  • Case Name: SCHROTH et al v. MONKEY TRUNKS SACO LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 02, 2022: [Order]
  • February 02, 2022: [Order on Sealed Motion]
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
  • June 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal]
April, 2021
  • April 26, 2021: [Notice of Settlement and Procedural Order Re: Settlement]
  • April 06, 2021: [Order]
  • April 06, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 01, 2021: [Order]
  • April 01, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
March, 2021
  • March 11, 2021: [Procedural Order Re: Local Rule 56(h)]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [Order]
November, 2020
  • November 25, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 27, 2020: [Order on Motion for Confidentiality Order]
March, 2020
  • March 10, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
January, 2020
  • January 06, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
November, 2019
  • November 16, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 07, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
October, 2019
  • October 22, 2019: [Order on Motion to Stay]
September, 2019
  • September 20, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • September 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
June, 2019
  • June 25, 2019: [Order on Objection to Scheduling Order]
  • June 11, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
May, 2019
  • May 07, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.