U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00203
  • Case Name: DUFFY v. WAL-MART STORES EAST LP
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 11, 2020: [Notice of Settlement and Procedural Order Re: Settlement]
October, 2019
  • October 16, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
August, 2019
  • August 03, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
July, 2019
  • July 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
May, 2019
  • May 23, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 16, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • May 08, 2019: [Procedural Order Re: Removal of Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.