U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cv-00119
  • Case Name: US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF9 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST v. KING
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Judgment of Foreclosure]
  • September 27, 2021: [Order on Bench Trial]
  • September 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
July, 2021
  • July 15, 2021: [Final Pretrial Conference & Order]
  • July 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Oral Argument/Hearing]
  • July 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Stay]
March, 2021
  • March 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [Order on Motion for Recusal]
June, 2020
  • June 09, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 09, 2020: [Order on Objection]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Order of Recusal]
  • January 15, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • January 15, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
September, 2019
  • September 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
  • September 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Entry of Default]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal]
May, 2019
  • May 09, 2019: [Order on Objection]
  • May 09, 2019: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.