U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00204
  • Case Name: HINOTE v. JORDAN et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2020
  • July 24, 2020: [Judgment]
  • July 24, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Prosecution]
February, 2020
  • February 27, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
December, 2019
  • December 17, 2019: [Order for Service]
  • December 16, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
  • December 16, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
July, 2019
  • July 16, 2019: [Order on Order to Show Cause]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • May 13, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.