U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cv-00170
  • Case Name: COOKSON v. MAGNUSSON
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 22, 2021: [Judgment]
  • June 22, 2021: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • June 22, 2021: [Order on Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
May, 2021
  • May 11, 2021: [Order on Appeal from Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court]
April, 2021
  • April 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Oral Argument/Hearing]
January, 2021
  • January 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Compel]
March, 2020
  • March 24, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
September, 2019
  • September 12, 2019: [Order on Motion to Compel]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • July 25, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • July 12, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
May, 2019
  • May 14, 2019: [Order to Answer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.