U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cv-00215
  • Case Name: BARRONTON v. LAMBREW, PHD et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2019
  • August 06, 2019: [Judgment]
  • August 06, 2019: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
July, 2019
  • July 09, 2019: [Judgment]
  • July 09, 2019: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • July 09, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • July 09, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
June, 2019
  • June 20, 2019: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • June 20, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend]
  • June 06, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal]
May, 2019
  • May 15, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • May 15, 2019: [Order on Ex Parte Motion (No Notice)]
  • May 15, 2019: [Order on Motion for Oral Argument/Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.