U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00079
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. JORDAN ASSOCIATES et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 27, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
August, 2019
  • August 09, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • August 09, 2019: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • August 07, 2019: [Order on Order to Show Cause]
  • August 07, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
July, 2019
  • July 12, 2019: [Order]
  • July 12, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • July 03, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 03, 2019: [Order of Recusal]
May, 2019
  • May 15, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.