U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00213
  • Case Name: TUCKER v. TOWN OF SCARBOROUGH
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 03, 2021: [Order Dismissing Case]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Notice of Settlement and Procedural Order Re: Settlement]
June, 2020
  • June 17, 2020: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
February, 2020
  • February 10, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
January, 2020
  • January 30, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
December, 2019
  • December 17, 2019: [Order]
  • December 17, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
November, 2019
  • November 25, 2019: [Procedural Order Re: Local Rule 56(h)]
October, 2019
  • October 04, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
May, 2019
  • May 17, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.