U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00176
  • Case Name: GLYNN et al v. MAINE OXY-ACETYLENE SUPPLY CO et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Approval of Settlement]
  • December 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
September, 2022
  • September 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Approval of Settlement]
June, 2022
  • June 15, 2022: [Order]
May, 2022
  • May 18, 2022: [Order]
  • May 18, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • May 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
April, 2022
  • April 19, 2022: [Order]
  • April 14, 2022: [Procedural Order Re: Local Rule 56(h)]
  • April 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • April 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Sanctions]
  • April 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases]
  • April 05, 2022: [Order]
March, 2022
  • March 21, 2022: [Order]
  • March 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
  • March 02, 2022: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Order]
January, 2022
  • January 10, 2022: [Order]
November, 2021
  • November 08, 2021: [Order]
  • November 03, 2021: [Order]
October, 2021
  • October 14, 2021: [Order]
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Confidentiality Order]
June, 2021
  • June 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend Procedural Order]
February, 2021
  • February 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Order]
  • January 29, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • January 27, 2021: [Order]
November, 2020
  • November 13, 2020: [Order]
  • November 13, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 05, 2020: [Order on Motion to Certify Class]
May, 2020
  • May 28, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend]
April, 2020
  • April 28, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
March, 2020
  • March 16, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
December, 2019
  • December 03, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
November, 2019
  • November 07, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Order]
  • September 18, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
  • September 11, 2019: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • September 11, 2019: [Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings]
  • September 03, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
May, 2019
  • May 30, 2019: [Order on Motion for Confidentiality Order]
  • May 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.