U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00157
  • Case Name: US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF9 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST v. MOORE
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 15, 2022: [Writ Issued]
April, 2022
  • April 22, 2022: [Order]
March, 2022
  • March 08, 2022: [Order]
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
December, 2021
  • December 23, 2021: [Order]
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: [Judgment of Foreclosure]
  • November 19, 2021: [Order]
October, 2021
  • October 15, 2021: [Order]
  • October 14, 2021: [Order]
  • October 04, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
September, 2021
  • September 13, 2021: [Order]
  • September 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
August, 2021
  • August 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
July, 2021
  • July 16, 2021: [Order]
  • July 16, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
May, 2021
  • May 05, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend]
  • May 05, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
October, 2020
  • October 05, 2020: [Order on Motion to Strike]
August, 2020
  • August 17, 2020: [Order on Order to Show Cause]
  • August 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Sanctions]
  • August 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
July, 2020
  • July 17, 2020: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
April, 2020
  • April 27, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 2]
  • April 27, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
  • April 27, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 27, 2020: [Order on Objection]
  • April 22, 2020: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • April 22, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
March, 2020
  • March 10, 2020: [Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases]
January, 2020
  • January 29, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 15, 2020: [Order on Objection]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • November 26, 2019: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • November 26, 2019: [Order on Motion for Oral Argument/Hearing]
  • November 25, 2019: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • November 25, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
  • November 24, 2019: [Order on Objection]
  • November 20, 2019: [Order]
  • November 20, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Order]
October, 2019
  • October 28, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 30, 2019: [Order on Motion for Entry of Default]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.