U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00235
  • Case Name: PUNSKY v. CITY OF PORTLAND et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 16, 2021: [Judgment]
  • November 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
May, 2021
  • May 06, 2021: [Order]
  • May 06, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
April, 2021
  • April 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend]
January, 2021
  • January 08, 2021: [Procedural Order Re: Local Rule 56(h)]
December, 2020
  • December 22, 2020: [Order]
  • December 09, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend]
June, 2020
  • June 29, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
December, 2019
  • December 20, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • December 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Confidentiality Order]
August, 2019
  • August 29, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
June, 2019
  • June 04, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.