U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cv-00230
  • Case Name: WOODLANDS SENIOR LIVING LLC v. MAS MEDICAL STAFFING CORPORATION
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 10, 2021: [Notice of Settlement and Procedural Order Re: Settlement]
May, 2021
  • May 21, 2021: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
November, 2020
  • November 23, 2020: [Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings]
  • November 11, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
  • November 10, 2020: [Order]
  • November 10, 2020: [Procedural Order Re: Local Rule 56(h)]
October, 2020
  • October 16, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend Procedural Order]
July, 2020
  • July 20, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend]
June, 2020
  • June 25, 2020: [Order on Motion to Intervene]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Order]
January, 2020
  • January 18, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
October, 2019
  • October 01, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
July, 2019
  • July 09, 2019: [Order on Motion for Confidentiality Order]
June, 2019
  • June 06, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.