U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00259
  • Case Name: CAMDEN NATIONAL BANK v. SARAH HOLLOWAY M/V et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2019
  • November 15, 2019: [Writ Issued]
October, 2019
  • October 23, 2019: [Order on Bill of Costs]
  • October 09, 2019: [Order on Bill of Costs]
  • October 04, 2019: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
August, 2019
  • August 09, 2019: [Order on Motion for Order]
July, 2019
  • July 23, 2019: [Order]
  • July 23, 2019: [~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Oral Argument/Hearing]
  • July 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
June, 2019
  • June 11, 2019: [Judgment]
  • June 11, 2019: [Order on Motion for Judgment]
  • June 11, 2019: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • June 11, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appoint Custodian]
  • June 11, 2019: [Order on Motion for Issuance of Warrant in rem]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.