U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00166
  • Case Name: DASTINOT v. AUBURN POLICE DEPARTMENT,et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [Judgment]
  • January 06, 2023: [Order on Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
October, 2022
  • October 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Oral Argument/Hearing]
August, 2022
  • August 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
July, 2022
  • July 15, 2022: [Judgment]
  • July 14, 2022: [Judgment]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Order]
  • June 17, 2022: [Kepreos Order]
  • June 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
December, 2021
  • December 13, 2021: [Order]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Order on Motion in Limine]
October, 2021
  • October 06, 2021: [Order]
  • October 06, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: [Order]
  • June 28, 2021: [Final Pretrial Conference & Order]
April, 2021
  • April 28, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
March, 2020
  • March 30, 2020: [Final Pretrial Conference & Order]
February, 2020
  • February 11, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • February 07, 2020: [Order on Motion in Limine]
January, 2020
  • January 04, 2020: [Order on Motion for Judgment]
  • January 03, 2020: [Order]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: [Final Pretrial Conference & Order]
  • October 22, 2019: [Order on Motion for Protection from Trial]
  • October 08, 2019: [Order]
August, 2019
  • August 16, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
July, 2019
  • July 17, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
June, 2019
  • June 27, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 27, 2019: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • June 27, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
  • June 27, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.